HI SCR207 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR207
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Submitting To The Legislature Of The State Of Hawaii For Review And Approval Of Action Taken By The Board Of Land And Natural Resources On A Land Exchange Between The State Of Hawaii And Parker Land Trust.
Title
Submitting To The Legislature Of The State Of Hawaii For Review And Approval Of Action Taken By The Board Of Land And Natural Resources On A Land Exchange Between The State Of Hawaii And Parker Land Trust.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 564). |
2021-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-16 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, McDermott, Ohno, Tokioka excused (5). |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1880), recommending adoption. |
2021-04-14 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Todd, Tokioka. |
2021-04-12 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 04-14-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-07 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1644), recommending referral to JHA. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 04-06-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1515) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 1:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR207 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.