HI SCR206 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR206
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Establish The Burial Sites Working Group To Examine The Burial Sites Program Under The Department Of Land And Natural Resources' State Historic Preservation Division.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Establish The Burial Sites Working Group To Examine The Burial Sites Program Under The Department Of Land And Natural Resources' State Historic Preservation Division.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 573) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1448) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Riviere. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee on HWN/WTL will reconsider its previous decision on 03-23-21 and will hold a public decision making on 03-30-21 1:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:01PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR206 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 32
HCR133 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 25
SR171 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR133 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 25
SR171 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.