HI SCR198 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Capitol Modern Museum And State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Increase Opportunities For Artists, Songwriters, And Producers To Showcase Their Talent On A Public Platform While Fostering Access To All Forms Of Art.
Title
Encouraging The Capitol Modern Museum And State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Increase Opportunities For Artists, Songwriters, And Producers To Showcase Their Talent On A Public Platform While Fostering Access To All Forms Of Art.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 456) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3619) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR174 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24