HI SCR194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Ensure That All Public School Students, Including Public Charter School Students, Have Equal Access To Appropriate Food Services.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Ensure That All Public School Students, Including Public Charter School Students, Have Equal Access To Appropriate Food Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2043-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ing, McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2018-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 04-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2018-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 485) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-18. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3379) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-28-18 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU/JDC. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |