HI SCR191 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education, In Consultation With The State Librarian, To Explore The Feasibility Of Activating A Statewide Library Advisory Commission.
Title
Hawaii State Public Library System; Library Advisory Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3). |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1756), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-04-18 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Takai. |
2013-04-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-04-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 04-18-13 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 683). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1488) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1090), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=191&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR191_.HTM |