HI SCR190 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR190
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Conduct A Study To Assess The Adequacy Of The Department's Vocational Education Programs To Prepare Students For A Career In A Vocation.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Conduct A Study To Assess The Adequacy Of The Department's Vocational Education Programs To Prepare Students For A Career In A Vocation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2221), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-10 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-19 at 2:00PM. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 04-10-19 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 639). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1846) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1628), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR190 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=190&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR190_.HTM |