HI SCR184 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Federal And State Agencies To Consult With Hawaii Small Scale Farmers, Hawaii Small Scale Producers, And Affected Parties On The Offsetting Of Costs Associated With The Implementation Of The Food Safety Modernization Act.
Title
FDA; Food Safety Modernization Act; Hawaii Small Scale Farmers
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from AGL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1175), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-30-15 1:40PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to AGL/HWN, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=184&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR184_.HTM |