HI SCR176 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR176
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to WLH/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to WLH/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Complete The Total Maximum Daily Load Process For Kaelepulu Watershed In Kailua, Oahu.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Complete The Total Maximum Daily Load Process For Kaelepulu Watershed In Kailua, Oahu.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to WLH/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 633). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1795) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to CPH/WTL. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR176 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to WLH/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 50
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=176&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR176_.HTM |