HI SCR171 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Report On The Feasibility Of Establishing A Foreclosure Mitigation Counseling Program To Assist Hawaii's Homeowners.
Title
LRB; Foreclosure Mitigation Counseling
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from EDH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2889), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ihara, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/CPN deferred the measure until 03-24-10 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDH/CPN, WAM. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) Offered. |