HI SCR168 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Substance Abuse Task Force.
Title
Substance Abuse Treatment Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=168&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR168_.HTM |