HI SCR164 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Referred to CAI, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Referred to CAI, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States To Support Taiwan's Participation In International Organizations, Including The World Health Organization, International Criminal Police Organization, United Nations Framework Convention On Climate Change, And International Civil Aviation Organization And Urging International Organizations To Grant Taiwan Membership, Observer, Or Other Appropriate Status.
Title
Urging The United States To Support Taiwan's Participation In International Organizations, Including The World Health Organization, International Criminal Police Organization, United Nations Framework Convention On Climate Change, And International Civil Aviation Organization And Urging International Organizations To Grant Taiwan Membership, Observer, Or Other Appropriate Status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to CAI, referral sheet 28 |
2023-03-30 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 518). |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-30-23. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1432) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, McKelvey. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TCA added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-23 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TCA. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR68 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.