HI SCR162 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR162
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education To Establish A Process Whereby The Public May Petition The Board To Add Items To The Agenda Of The Next Meeting.
Title
Requesting The Board Of Education To Establish A Process Whereby The Public May Petition The Board To Add Items To The Agenda Of The Next Meeting.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 54 |
2018-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 483). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-18. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3377) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-28-18 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR162 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=162&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR162_.HTM |