HI SCR157 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR157

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Apologizing For The Internment Of Predominately Japanese Americans At The Honouliuli Internment Camp During World War Ii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apologizing For The Internment Of Predominately Japanese Americans At The Honouliuli Internment Camp During World War Ii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-10SenateReferred to JDC.
2020-03-06SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR157 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 49

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback