HI SCR157 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-05 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 60
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-05 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 60
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Task Force To Examine State Regulation Of The Harvesting Of Hawaiian Sandalwood.
Title
Hawaiian Sandalwood; Conservation and Regulation of Harvesting; Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 60 | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 459) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-02 | (S) One Day Notice 04-03-12. | |
2012-04-02 | (S) Reported from WLH/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3130) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 03-29-12 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 2:50PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to WLH/AGL. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |