HI SCR152 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR152
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Mandating Health Insurance Coverage For Oocyte Cryopreservation.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Mandating Health Insurance Coverage For Oocyte Cryopreservation.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-04-12 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 46 |
2022-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 654) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3692) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR152 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR145 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
SR145 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.