HI SCR152 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR152
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Coordinate With The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Implement A Graduation Requirement Of At Least A Half Credit In Financial Literacy During The Junior Year Or Senior Year.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Coordinate With The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Implement A Graduation Requirement Of At Least A Half Credit In Financial Literacy During The Junior Year Or Senior Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 592). |
2021-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Perruso excused (2). |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1903), recommending adoption. |
2021-04-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. |
2021-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-15-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1728), recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Ohno, Quinlan. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 04-06-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 541). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1308) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR152 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR65 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 20
SR118 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR65 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 20
SR118 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.