HI SCR149 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Introduce Legislation To Clarify Food Labeling Requirements Pertaining To Genetically Modified Organisms.
Title
Genetically Modified Organisms; Labeling; Federal Legislation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 50 |
2014-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 482) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from PSM/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3192) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-14 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPN. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |