HI SCR147 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - The committee on TSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - The committee on TSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Study The Feasibility Of Establishing A Trust Fund As A Means To Encourage People To Make Strong Financial Investments While Supporting Conservation, Reforestation Of Hawaii's Native Trees, Environmental Stewardship, Sustainable Food And Energy Production, And Programs That Support And Benefit Keiki And Kupuna, To Establish An Eco-tourism Program That Allows Visitors And Residents Of Hawaii To Contribute Toward Planting Native Or Food-bearing Trees In Designated Areas Throughout The State, And To Report On Findings And Recommendations To The Legislature Prior To The 2015 Regular Session.
Title
Keiki, Opio, and Kupuna Trust Fund; DLNR Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee on TSM deferred the measure. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee on ENE deferred the measure. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/ENE/TSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-14 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to WTL/ENE/TSM. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=147&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/SCR147_.HTM |