HI SCR145 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Affirm Its Commitment To Make The State The Lead In The Conservation, Management, And Protection Of Hawaii's Natural Resources And To Resist Efforts By The Federal Government To Expand Federal Jurisdiction Over Hawaii's Natural Resources In The Designation Of Critical Habitats, Expansion Of Current Co-manager Relationships, Or The Creation Of New Co-manager Relationships.
Title
DLNR; Conservation Lead
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 694). |
2014-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-16 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Wooley excused (2). |
2014-04-16 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-14. |
2014-04-16 | House | Re-referred to WAL, referral sheet 57 |
2014-04-15 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 04-17-14 2:15PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Thursday, 04-17-14 2:15PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro, Wooley excused (3). |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1679-14), recommending referral to OMH. |
2014-04-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Hanohano. |
2014-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 04-14-14 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to WAL, OMH, referral sheet 50 |
2014-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 479) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3230) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Tokuda. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Taniguchi. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-14 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/PSM/WAM. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |