HI SCR136 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2297), recommending adoption.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, Division Of Forestry And Wildlife To Document The History Of Exemplary Contributions Made By Community Members, Including Kupuna, Conservationists, And Citizens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, Division Of Forestry And Wildlife To Document The History Of Exemplary Contributions Made By Community Members, Including Kupuna, Conservationists, And Citizens.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2297), recommending adoption.
2019-04-18HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott.
2019-04-16HouseScheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308.
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2259), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-04-10HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 626).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1797) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:20PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to WTL.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR40 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback