HI SCR133 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to WAL, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to WAL, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Every State Agency That Monitors Environmental Toxins And Pollutants To Follow Certain Procedural And Substantive Requirements For The Establishment And Modifications Of Environmental Action Levels.
Title
Urging Every State Agency That Monitors Environmental Toxins And Pollutants To Follow Certain Procedural And Substantive Requirements For The Establishment And Modifications Of Environmental Action Levels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to WAL, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 421). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3444) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR209 (Same As) 2024-03-19 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SR115 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
SR115 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.