HI SCR129 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR129
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Civil Rights Commission To Clarify Claims Within The Scope Of The Individuals With Disabilities Education Act.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Civil Rights Commission To Clarify Claims Within The Scope Of The Individuals With Disabilities Education Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC/HMS. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR129 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to WTL/HRE.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=129&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SCR129_.HTM |