HI SCR129 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (H) Referred to HLT/CPC, LMG, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (H) Referred to HLT/CPC, LMG, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct An Impact Assessment Report On Legislation Mandating Certain Health Insurance Coverage For Outpatient Prescription Drugs.
Title
Prescription Drug Coverage; Copayment; Auditor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to HLT/CPC, LMG, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 729) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3411) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3095), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Wakai, Slom. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 1:47PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |