HI SCR126 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Work With Moanalua Gardens Foundation To Execute A Memorandum Of Understanding For The Use Of Kamananui (moanalua) Valley For Educational And Cultural Purposes.
Title
Kamananui Valley; DLNR; Moanalua Gardens Foundation; Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-11 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to WLH. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=126 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SCR126_.HTM |