HI SCR116 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR116

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Submit A Report To The Legislature On All Current State Gun Control Laws, How They Compare With Current Federal Regulations, Data On Firearm Discharges, And Data On Gun Crime In Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Submit A Report To The Legislature On All Current State Gun Control Laws, How They Compare With Current Federal Regulations, Data On Firearm Discharges, And Data On Gun Crime In Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateResolution adopted in final form.
2018-04-17SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 613).
2018-04-16HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2018-04-16HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
2018-04-16HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2050-18), recommending adoption.
2018-04-13HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, C. Lee, McDermott.
2018-04-11HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 04-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2018-04-04HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 52
2018-04-02HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 465) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-04-02SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-29SenateOne Day Notice 04-02-18.
2018-03-29SenateReported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3344) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2018-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2018-03-15SenateReferred to PSM/JDC.
2018-03-09SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR116 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback