HI SCR116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging State Departments And Agencies To Implement Worksite Wellness Programs And Identify A Manager To Serve As The Wellness Leader.
Title
Encouraging State Departments And Agencies To Implement Worksite Wellness Programs And Identify A Manager To Serve As The Wellness Leader.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from GVO/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Tokuda. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to GVO/CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR116 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
HCR159 (Same As) 2017-04-13 - Re-Referred to JDL/WAM.
HCR159 (Same As) 2017-04-13 - Re-Referred to JDL/WAM.