HI SCR113 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kapaa, Kawaihau, Kauai, For The Construction, Maintenance, And Repair Of A Temporary Sand Groin To Shelter Kuhio Beach From Nearshore Currents And Slow Littoral Drift.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kapaa, Kawaihau, Kauai, For The Construction, Maintenance, And Repair Of A Temporary Sand Groin To Shelter Kuhio Beach From Nearshore Currents And Slow Littoral Drift.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-15-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-07 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1639), recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 04-06-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 527) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1504) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-21 9:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 1:45PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR113 (Carry Over) 2021-04-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR166 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR166 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.