HI SCR111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States To Endorse The Treaty On The Prohibition Of Nuclear Weapons To Support United Nations' Sustainable Development Goal 16 Calling For Peace, Justice, And Strong Institutions.
Title
Urging The United States To Endorse The Treaty On The Prohibition Of Nuclear Weapons To Support United Nations' Sustainable Development Goal 16 Calling For Peace, Justice, And Strong Institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR111 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=111&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR111_.HTM |