HI SCR111 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) S. Chang, Taniguchi; and 0 Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) S. Chang, Taniguchi; and 0 Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii Labor Relations Board, And Other Concerned Agencies Or Judicial Bodies, To Take Notice Of The Legislature's Intent To Enable Exclusive Representatives To Maintain Financial Viability And Organizational Capacity And Effectively Represent Public Employees, And To Remove Or Reduce Financial Incentives For Employees To "free Ride".
Title
Urging The Hawaii Labor Relations Board, And Other Concerned Agencies Or Judicial Bodies, To Take Notice Of The Legislature's Intent To Enable Exclusive Representatives To Maintain Financial Viability And Organizational Capacity And Effectively Represent Public Employees, And To Remove Or Reduce Financial Incentives For Employees To "free Ride".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) S. Chang, Taniguchi; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to LBR. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR111 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Referred to GVO/PSM/TRE, WAM.
HCR122 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR122 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=111&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR111_.HTM |