HI SCR111 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Study Issues Relating To Self-governance And Dispute Resolution Under Hawaii's Current Condominium Law.
Title
Condominiums; LRB; Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1213), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Wakai. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-15 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |