HI SCR105 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR105
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Veterinary Medical Association To Conduct A Survey Of Its Membership On The Frequency Of Cases Of Rat Lungworm Disease In Animal Companions.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Veterinary Medical Association To Conduct A Survey Of Its Membership On The Frequency Of Cases Of Rat Lungworm Disease In Animal Companions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR105 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HCR225 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to CPH.
HCR225 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=105&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR105_.HTM |