HI SCR105 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services And Department Of Health To Not Consider Certain Benefits Under Title Ii Of The Social Security Act As Income When Determining Medicaid Eligibility And To Adopt Rules To Allow A Provider Of Medicaid Adult Day Health Services To Bill In Fifteen Minute Increments.
Title
Medicaid; Supplemental Security Income; Income Eligibility; Billing
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HSH/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1230), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to HSH/HTH, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=105&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR105_.HTM |