HI SCR105 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Implementation Of Twelve-month Principal Performance Contracts By The 2011-2012 School Year.
Title
DOE; HGEA; Principal Performance Contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/LBR added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-15-10 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDH/LBR. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=105&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SCR105_.HTM |