HI SB988 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB988
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies procedures for an exemption from building permit and building code requirements pursuant to section 46-88, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and clarifies that section 46-88 does not exempt any new or existing agricultural buildings, structures, related appurtenances, or other development from local, state, or federal floodplain management development standards, ordinances, codes, statutes, rules, or regulations pursuant to National Flood Insurance Program requirements. Takes effect 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Exemption For Agricultural Buildings And Structures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 318) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 776) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ihara. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Ruderman. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/AEN, JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 1:16PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1122 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB988 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB988 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27