HI SB986 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB986
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of planning to hire a contractor to, among other things, identify and assess alternative financing, project delivery, and cost recovery mechanisms to recapture the State's upfront investment in transit-oriented development infrastructure. Requires the contractor to consult with representatives of certain government entities. Requires the office of planning to report its findings to the legislature. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Transit-oriented Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EET, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1130 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
SB986 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL/EET, WAM.
SB986 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL/EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=986&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB986_.HTM |