HI HB1130 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1130
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Planning to hire a contractor to, among other things, identify and assess alternative financing, project delivery, and cost recovery mechanisms to recapture the State's upfront investment in transit-oriented development infrastructure. Requires the contractor to consult with representatives of certain government entities. Requires the Office of Planning to report its findings to the Legislature. Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Transit-oriented Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797). |
2022-04-25 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Misalucha. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Nakamura, Tarnas, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Matsumoto. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 759) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1661) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Taniguchi. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1248) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EET, WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 163). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 432) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 209) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/HSG on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to TRN/HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB986 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1130 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842).
HB1130 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842).