HI SB98 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 132, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 132, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the requirement that a driver of a motor vehicle yield to or stop for a pedestrian by specifying when a pedestrian is considered to be within an intersection or adjacent crosswalk or crossing the roadway within a crosswalk. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Crosswalk Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act 132, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234). |
2019-06-28 | House | Act 132, on 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 62) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 62). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, C. Lee, Hashimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, K. Rhoads, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 10:25AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Shimabukuro, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-04-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 522). |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1923), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1395) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-15-19 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 16). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 806) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 324) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1256 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6