HI SB978 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 3:15PM in conference room 329.
Hearing: Apr 23 @ 3:15 pm in Conference Room 329
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the disposition of unclaimed funds in the Unclaimed Property Trust Fund to allocate funds under a certain amount to the Libraries Special Fund and to amend the threshold amount for funds transferred to the General Fund. Amends the time limit for retaining unclaimed funds in the Trust Fund. (SB978 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Library System.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 3:15PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, C. Lee, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2196) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
2019-04-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1656), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-03-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1313) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 314) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 945) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 133) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 2:55PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback