HI SB978 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support anti-bullying and suicide prevention efforts in Hawaii's public schools.
Title
Youth Suicide Prevention; Anti-bullying; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB396 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=978&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB978_.HTM |