HI SB978 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 210, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1313).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 210, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1313).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sentencing to a term of probation if the defendant is convicted of cruelty to animals in the first or second degree where the crime involves ten or more pet animals. Makes the offense of cruelty to animals in the second degree involving ten or more pet animals in any one instance a class C felony. (CD1)
Title
Penal Code; Animal Cruelty; Sentencing
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 210, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1313). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 210, on 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1313). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 74). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 4-30-13 |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 74) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Rhoads Chair; Kawakami, Thielen. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 581). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-21 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 261). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 487) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |