HI SB977 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB977
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for judicial review of orders fixing minimum terms of imprisonment. Specifies that in any civil action brought by the petitioner seeking compensation of any kind or nature whatsoever as a result of, related to, or arising from a conviction and imprisonment for crimes for which the person was actually innocent, any recovery will offset, dollar for dollar, the total award made in the civil action against whom claims are asserted. Repeals section 661B-7, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Takes effect 03/22/2075. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 473) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB977 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB862 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB862 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.