HI SB968 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB968
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Public Safety to inspect shipping containers for illegal fireworks and explosives. Establishes a shipping container inspection program using explosive-sniffing dogs and associated special fund. Authorizes Department of Transportation to impose shipping container import fees. Increases fine for fireworks violations.
Title
Relating To Cargo Inspections.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB858 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB968 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to PSM/TRS, JDC/WAM.
SB968 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to PSM/TRS, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=968&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB968_.HTM |