HI SB967 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of regents to submit to the legislature for approval salary range proposals equal to or in excess of two times the governor's salary prior to recruiting for such positions. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
University of Hawaii; Salaries; Legislative Approval
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-12-13 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 258) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Tokuda ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 416) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Ige, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Tokuda ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |