HI SB965 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB965
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes green infrastructure objectives and policies for transportation systems, infrastructure, and projects. Establishes the green transportation infrastructure task force to examine, evaluate, and develop policies for the design, implementation, and maintenance of green transportation infrastructure. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Green Transportation Infrastructure.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from TRN/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1520) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/EEP on Tuesday, 03-21-23 11:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 320) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1068) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 225) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1278 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB965 (Carry Over) 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
SB965 (Carry Over) 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).