HI SB964 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB964

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Broadens the definition of "food waste" as used in integrated solid waste management. Excludes facilities designed primarily for composting organic material such as food waste and green waste, on-site school campus food waste programs, and recycling drop-off facilities from the requirement that disposal facilities shall not be constructed, modified, or expanded without first establishing a buffer zone of no less than one-half mile from the nearest residential, school, or hospital property line. Establishes a class of artisan-scale composting operations exempt from department of health regulations to divert organic materials from Hawaii's landfills. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Waste Management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-25SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-16SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 266) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to AEN, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB856 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB964 (Carry Over) 2021-02-25 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback