HI HB856 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB856

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Part I: Clarifies that composting facilities are excluded from buffer zone requirements. Part II: Establishes a class of artisan-scale composting operations. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Waste Management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-16HouseThe committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2021-02-11HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 197) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
2021-02-09HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-04HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-21.
2021-02-02HouseBill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB964 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB856 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback