HI SB963 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB963
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist HK Management, LLC, in planning, designing, constructing, reconstructing, renovating, acquiring, equipping, and improving surf industry center facilities.
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Hk Management, Llc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB963 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
HB1289 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1289 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3