HI SB962 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the department of human services for an interpreter referral service for public and private entities serving individuals who are not participants of the department of human services' vocational rehabilitation program.
Title
Interpreter Referral Services; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=962&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB962_.HTM |