HI SB961 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB961

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of health clean water branch to establish a working group and conduct a study on the feasibility of implementing pollution netting technology on the State's storm water drainage systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Water Pollution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-08SenateRe-Referred to AEN, WAM.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to AEN/HTH, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB961 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback