HI SB960 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain records of the Department of Hawaiian Home lands are not be required to be publicly disclosed or made open to inspection pursuant to public records requests. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Personal Privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB960 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
HB1094 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
HB1094 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).